FL S0818 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising education requirements for licensure by examination as a marriage and family therapist; requiring a licensed mental health professional to be accessible by telephone or other electronic means when a registered intern is providing services through telehealth; deleting a requirement that a licensed mental health professional be on the premises when a registered intern is providing clinical services in a private setting; authorizing courts to appoint mental health professionals licensed under ch. 491, F.S., as experts in criminal cases, etc.
Title
Mental Health Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/17/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H941 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S1568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
S1568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
491 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |