FL S0816 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a prevailing party to show that the challenge to a development order was frivolous before the prevailing party is entitled to recover reasonable attorney fees and costs; prohibiting a prevailing party in a challenge to a comprehensive plan from an award of reasonable attorney fees and costs; providing that intervenors are not entitled to recover reasonable attorney fees and costs and may not recover certain attorney fees and costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Challenges to Development Orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Community Affairs
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-02-23SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2023-02-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H843 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633215Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback