FL S0816 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to adopt legislation lowering the allowable ratio of sodium to potassium in processed and restaurant foods sold and consumed in the United States, etc.
Title
Allowable Ratio of Sodium to Potassium in Processed and Restaurant Foods
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Rules |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/816 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/816/BillText/Filed/HTML |