FL S0808 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing exemptions from the sales and use tax for specified disaster preparedness supplies during specified timeframes; defining the term "impact-resistant"; requiring purchasers of certain items to furnish a specified affidavit and information to the selling dealer; providing a criminal penalty for furnishing a false affidavit with certain intent; specifying locations where the exemptions do not apply, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Holiday for Disaster Preparedness Supplies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14SenateDied in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2022-03-12SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2021-11-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7071 (Similar To) 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-97

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback