FL S0808 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 705
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption for valuations, certain records, and sales offers for sales related to surplus lands; authorizing disclosure of such records under certain circumstances; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Surplus Lands

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 705
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 705
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-02-07SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
2018-02-07SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-02-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-05SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/05/18, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/16/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-11-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S806 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 703
H705 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-156
H703 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-155

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373089Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback