FL S0808 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that murder in the first degree includes the unlawful killing of a human being which resulted from the unlawful distribution of methadone by a person aged 18 or older when such drug is proven to be the proximate cause of the death of the user, etc.
Title
Murder/Unlawful Distribution of Methadone [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1039 - Passage (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0006 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0006 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-121 | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01217; Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 01217 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01166 | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages; Received -HJ 01097; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01097 | |
2010-04-23 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00760; Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00760 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00746 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00650 | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 37-S | |
2010-04-08 | Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-05 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-04 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00058; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2009-11-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0369 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 808 (Ch. 2010-121)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0775 | 0823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0782 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0947 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |