FL S0802 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the FortifyFL reporting tool to notify reporting parties that submitting false information may subject them to criminal penalties; requiring the Commissioner of Education to oversee and enforce compliance with requirements relating to school safety and security; requiring certain law enforcement officers to be physically present and directly involved in active assailant emergency drills; authorizing school safety officers to make arrests on property owned or leased by a charter school under a charter contract, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2022-01-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2022-01-11SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2021-11-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1421 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10061493Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943082Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback