FL S0800 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the University of Miami and its affiliates to establish sterile needle and syringe exchange pilot programs in Broward County and Palm Beach County; providing that the possession, distribution, or exchange of needles and syringes under the pilot program is not a violation of the Florida Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention and Control Act or any other law; prohibiting use of state, county, or municipal funds to operate the pilot program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infectious Disease Elimination Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-03HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 1
2018-03-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (478644)
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-31SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-24SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-11-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H579 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H945 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S1320 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810038Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback