FL S0796 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing an annual use fee for the Florida State Beekeepers Association license plate; directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Florida State Beekeepers Association license plate, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates/Florida State Beekeepers Association

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-11-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1359 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S160 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback