FL S0794 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring Medicaid managed care plans to submit certain performance metrics monthly to the Agency for Health Care Administration; requiring the agency to contract to develop and display on its public website a dashboard containing certain information; requiring the agency to create a quarterly report, beginning on a specified date, make it available to the public, and submit it to certain entities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Managed Care Plan Performance Metrics

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08SenateDied in Health Policy
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-12-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
2023-12-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H783 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4099673Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback