FL S0792 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring social media platforms to disclose specified information and provide specified resources, measures, and disclaimers; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, subject to legislative appropriation, to enforce specified provisions and implement specified measures; providing a fine for violations; prohibiting certain schools from requiring students to register, enroll, or participate in social media platforms for educational purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Media Protection for Minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-02-23SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
2023-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H591 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501174Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback