FL S0792 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a physician to perform an examination for, and inform a woman obtaining an abortion of the presence of, a detectable fetal heartbeat; requiring the physician to review the results of such examination with the patient before the woman gives informed consent for the abortion procedure; requiring that a woman who declines to review the results certify in writing that she did so of her own free will and without undue influence, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H235 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
390011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback