FL S0784 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 465
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain securities valuation limitations do not apply to certain stock of certain foreign insurers' subsidiary corporations or related entities; revising professional designations that exempt all-lines adjuster license applicants from an examination requirement; reducing the tax on surplus lines insurance; revising federal standards applicable to Department of Financial Services and Financial Services Commission rules governing the use of consumer nonpublic personal financial and health information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 465
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 465
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-26SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-23SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-23SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations
2018-02-23SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/20/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-08SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-02-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-08SenateRemaining references corrected to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2018-02-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-11-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H465 (Same As) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-131
H1073 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-102
S1292 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1073

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
624307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
625151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
625325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62743141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627748Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627756Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6284615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6288015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
629401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
636044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413107Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback