FL S0776 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "racketeering activity" to include certain actions relating to wild animal life, freshwater aquatic life, or marine life, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Racketeering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#315 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09 Chapter No. 2021-55
2021-06-04 Approved by Governor
2021-06-03 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-27HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-27SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
2021-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-26HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-26HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 400055 withdrawn
2021-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 400055 filed
2021-04-23House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-23HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/26/2021)
2021-04-23HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-01HouseIn Messages
2021-04-01SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-01SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-01SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-01SenateAmendment(s) adopted (594970, 931580)
2021-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-25SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-03-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/25/21
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-03-18SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-02SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2021-03-02SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-02SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/02/21, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-02-18SenateNow in Environment and Natural Resources
2021-02-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-02-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
2021-01-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H783 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/SB 776, 1st Eng.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
89502Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Amendment/328704/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Amendment/931580/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Amendment/594970/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Analyses/2021s00776.pre.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Analyses/2021s00776.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Analyses/2021s00776.pre.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Analyses/2021s00776.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Analyses/2021s00776.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Analyses/2021s00776.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Vote/SenateVote_s00776c1010.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Vote/HouseVote_s00776e1315.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Vote/2021-02-16%200900AM~S00776%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Vote/2021-03-02%200130PM~S00776%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/776/Vote/2021-03-18%200900AM~S00776%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback