FL S0770 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 873 (Ch. 2021-148)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 873 (Ch. 2021-148)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision requiring that certain military personnel have the same salary and benefits as career service employees; modifying minimum qualifications and duties of the Adjutant General; specifying that a court-martial is an administrative procedure under the executive branch of state government; authorizing the Adjutant General, the Adjutant General's designee, or a military judge to issue and execute search authorizations under specified circumstances, etc.
Title
Military Affairs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 873 (Ch. 2021-148) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 873 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/24/21, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/09/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H873 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-148
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 375 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |