FL S0768 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the "Luis Rivera Ortega Street Racing Act." Revises penalties for violating provisions prohibiting certain speed competitions and exhibitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Luis Rivera Ortega Street Racing Act [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1054 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0012 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-03 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-189
2010-05-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991
2010-04-28 Read 3rd time -HJ 01224; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 01224
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01170; Substituted for CS/HB 97 -HJ 01170
2010-04-26 Received -HJ 01097; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01097
2010-04-23 In Messages
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00725; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00725
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00680
2010-04-14 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00551
2010-04-13 Favorable by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551
2010-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 37-S
2010-04-01 Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00350
2010-03-29 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-26 CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00353
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 110-S
2010-03-10 Now in Judiciary -SJ 00189
2010-03-09 Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189
2010-03-04 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00055; On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/02/10, 1:30 pm, 37-S; Favorable with 2 amendment(s) by Transportation (279362, 621930); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments); Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00162
2010-02-08 Now in Criminal Justice
2010-02-03 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2010-02-02 Favorable with 2 amendment(s) by Transportation (279362, 621930); YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2010-01-25 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/02/10, 1:30 pm, 37-S
2009-12-17 Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
2009-11-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0097 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 768; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 768 (Ch. 2010-189) -HJ 01170

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0316191Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0768&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0768.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0768c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0768er.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB07680422100012.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB07680428101054.html

Bill Comments

feedback