FL S0766 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9019 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes June 16, 2010, as "Bud Bell Day" in the State of Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budd Bell Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9019 (Adopted)
2009-11-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H9019 (Similar To) 2010-04-06 - Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only; Read 2nd time -HJ 00609; Adopted -HJ 00609

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback