FL S0764 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the "Step Into Success Act"; establishing the Step Into Success internship program within the Department of Children and Families for eligible foster youth; requiring that eligible foster youth receive priority consideration for certain internship positions; requiring the department to publicize internship opportunities and inform foster youth of where to locate the information; requiring approved agencies to provide and monthly update a list of open employment opportunities for which eligible foster youth may apply; specifying requirements and conditions for foster youth to earn college credit for work performed in the internship program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Step Into Success Internship Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2021-11-30SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2021-11-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H757 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4091455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41456Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback