FL S0762 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the timeframe within which a certified appraisal may be obtained for lands to be sold as surplus; revising the procedures a water management district must follow for publishing a notice of intention to sell surplus lands; providing that parcels no longer essential or necessary for conservation purposes and valued below a certain threshold may be sold directly to the highest bidder; authorizing districts to include restrictions on future use of land sold, etc.
Title
Sale or Exchange of Surplus Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
259 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0677 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/762 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0762/BillText/Filed/HTML |