FL S0756 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Hearing: Jan 26 @ 10:00 am in 37 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding an existing public records exemption relating to human trafficking victims seeking expunction of certain records related to an offense listed in s. 775.084(1)(b)1., F.S.; providing for future review and repeal of the expanded exemption; providing for the reversion of specified provisions if the exemption is not saved from repeal; providing that a petition for human trafficking victim expunction and all pleadings and documents related to the petition are confidential and exempt from public records requirements; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Human Trafficking Victims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2022-01-18SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2022-01-12SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2022-01-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2022-01-11SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2021-11-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1441 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430583Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback