FL S0756 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration to pay for donor human milk bank services as an optional Medicaid service under certain conditions; adding donor human milk bank services to the list of Medicaid services authorized for reimbursement on a fee-for-service basis; adding donor human milk bank services to the list of services covered by managed care plans, etc.
Title
Donor Human Milk Bank Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H653 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/756 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/756/BillText/Filed/HTML |