FL S0754 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a school crossing guard employed by a private school, upon approval of the sheriff of the county in which such private school is located, to direct traffic at certain locations under certain circumstances; providing that the school crossing guard is not required to meet specified uniform minimum standards, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Crossing Guards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-06SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-06SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2020-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Education; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-11-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H699 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31675Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback