FL S0752 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 705
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Education to assist the Division of Emergency Management in determining strategies regarding the evacuation of persons with pets; requiring counties that maintain designated shelters to designate a shelter that can accommodate persons with pets; specifying requirements for such shelters, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Sheltering of Persons with Pets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 705
2020-03-05SenateSubstituted CS/HB 705
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-26SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Community Affairs
2020-01-29SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-11-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H705 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-132

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2523568Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback