FL S0752 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an annual use fee for the Childhood Cancer Awareness license plate; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Childhood Cancer Awareness license plate, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plates/Childhood Cancer Awareness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Messages |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H913 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |