FL S0748 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Florida Keys Property Rights Protection Act"; providing for the apportionment of awards of damages for takings claims within areas of critical state concern; providing that certain governmental entities are liable only for certain postjudgment interest; requiring local governments to be reimbursed for specified amounts under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Takings Claims Within Areas of Critical State Concern
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/15/20, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H587 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/748 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/748/BillText/Filed/HTML |