FL S0746 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying and location information of current and former judicial assistants and their spouses and children; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Judicial Assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Messages
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-26HouseIn Messages
2019-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-02SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H635 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback