FL S0742 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Includes dispatching as a function of E911 services. Includes fees for certification and recertification collected by the Department of Health in authorized expenditures for E911 services. Requires certain 911 public safety telecommunicators, sworn state-certified law enforcement officers, or state-certified firefighters to pass an examination administered by the department, etc.
Title
Public Safety Telecommunicators/E911 [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1059 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0015 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0015 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-188 | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01227; CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 01227 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01173 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -HJ 01097; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01097 | |
2010-04-22 | In Messages | |
2010-04-21 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00665; Amendment(s) adopted (198676) -SJ 00665; CS passed as amended (198676); YEAS 36 NAYS 2 -SJ 00665 | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00632; Amendment(s) adopted (392670) -SJ 00632; Was taken up -SJ 00634; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00634 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-09 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00526 | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00526; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00534 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00279 | |
2010-03-18 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-17 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00283 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/10, 3:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Community Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00055; On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/18/10, 8:00 am, 412-K; CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00156; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00163 | |
2010-03-01 | Now in Community Affairs | |
2010-02-19 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-02-18 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/18/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Health Regulation; Community Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2009-11-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0355 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 742 (Ch. 2010-188)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0365 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0401 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0401 | 465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |