FL S0736 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a ticket issuer to employ a nontransferable ticketing system only under specified circumstances; prohibiting a ticket buyer or seller from being penalized, discriminated against, or denied access to an event under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nontransferable Tickets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H331 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817362Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback