FL S0736 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted CS/CS/HB 351 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168) -SJ 01001
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted CS/CS/HB 351 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168) -SJ 01001
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Catch Me, Release Me license plate, a Florida Horse Park license plate, and a Florida Biodiversity Foundation license plate. Establishes annual use fees for the plates. Provides for the distribution of use fees received from the sale of such plates. Revises the portion of use fees collected from the sale of the Florida Salutes Veterans license plate which is distributed to a direct-support organization, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plates [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted CS/CS/HB 351 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168) -SJ 01001 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-26 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00863; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by General Government Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00650; Now in Rules -SJ 00650 | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 401-S | |
2010-04-12 | Original reference(s) removed: Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00572 | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00534 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; General Government Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00054 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Transportation; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; General Government Appropriations; Rules | |
2009-11-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0351 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-168
S1522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S1208 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168)
S1522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S1208 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |