FL S0734 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a certain application to provide the applicant with the option to fulfill any court-ordered financial obligation associated with a case by enrolling in a payment plan or by completing community service if ordered by the court; revising requirements relating to the payment of court-related fines or other monetary penalties, fees, charges, and costs; authorizing the court to review the reasonableness of the payment plan upon motion of the party and to modify the plan; prohibiting the suspension of a person's driver license solely for failure to pay certain financial obligations unless the clerk of court demonstrates to the court that the individual has the ability to pay but is refusing to do so, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalties and Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1013 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H1041 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S1574 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S1618 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
562111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8120155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
877112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93830Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback