FL S0734 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the council to appoint a seven-member committee on brain injury; providing for committee membership; specifying certain duties; requiring the committee to report to the council biannually; requiring the committee to report to the State Surgeon General annually, etc.
Title
Advisory Council on Brain and Spinal Cord Injuries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0645 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/734 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0734/BillText/Filed/HTML |