FL S0732 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to issue an emergency order suspending or restricting the registration of certain facilities upon specified findings; requiring an office in which a physician performs certain procedures or office surgeries to register with the department; requiring an office and physicians practicing at the office to meet certain financial responsibility requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Surgery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#333 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Chapter No. 2019-130
2019-06-25 Approved by Governor
2019-06-25 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseIn Messages
2019-04-25SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2019-04-25SenateAmendment(s) adopted (135768, 424552, 439154) 486
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (315200)
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-23SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-03-14SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H933 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 732 (Ch. 2019-130)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583266Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458328Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/Amendment/859422/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/Amendment/315200/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/Amendment/817946/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/Amendment/306682/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/Vote/SenateVote_s00732e1019.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/732/Vote/HouseVote_s00732e2333.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback