FL S0732 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the meaning of a rare disease within the definition of the term "disability" for purposes of the Gardiner Scholarship Program; specifying that a home education program is not a school district program and is registered with the district school superintendent only for the purpose of complying with the state's attendance requirements; establishing reading scholarship accounts for specified purposes; prohibiting a district school superintendent from requiring certain evidence relating to a child's age from children enrolled in specified schools and programs; authorizing a district school board participating in the Mastery-Based Education Pilot Program to award credit based on student mastery of certain content and skills; renaming the Competency-Based Education Pilot Program as the Mastery-Based Education Pilot Program; requiring the Department of Education to provide certain teacher and student ACT and PreACT information for the evaluation of certain services and activities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 731
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time 935
2018-03-07SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time 720
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
2018-01-24SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2018-01-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-22SenateCS by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-11-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H731 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-134
S1270 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H1095 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H323 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 88
H1 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1035 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
S968 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
S1172 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1286 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1820 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100735Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback