FL S0728 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Advanced Air Mobility Study Task Force adjunct to the Department of Transportation; specifying the composition of the task force; providing that task force members shall serve without compensation but are entitled to certain reimbursement; defining the term "eVTOL aircraft"; requiring the task force to submit a certain report to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Advanced Air Mobility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-23 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1005 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar