FL S0728 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Decreasing the criminal penalty for threatening to throw, project, place, or discharge any destructive device with intent to do bodily harm to any person or with intent to do damage to any property of any person; prohibiting threats to use a firearm or weapon with specified intent; providing criminal penalties; redefining the term "violence" to include incidents of cyberstalking, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Threats

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-10HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-05SenateAmendment(s) adopted (161760)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateCS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-22SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2019-11-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H311 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
784046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback