FL S0724 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefining the term "hospice"; defining the terms "hospice program" and "seriously ill"; clarifying provisions relating to hospice services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospice Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2017-11-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H497 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4006005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4006093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4006095Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback