FL S0720 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 449 909
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Tampa Sulphur Springs Neighborhood of Promise Success Zone within the City of Tampa in Hillsborough County and the Overtown Children and Youth Coalition within the City of Miami in Miami-Dade County; providing for the projects to be managed by not-for-profit corporations that are not subject to control, supervision, or direction by any department of the state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Initiatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 449 909
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted HB 449 909
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-01-09SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-11-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H449 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-148

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback