FL S0712 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting an autonomous vehicle being operated in autonomous mode from a certain prohibition on the operation of a motor vehicle if the vehicle is actively displaying certain content that is visible from the driver's seat while the vehicle is in motion; authorizing a fully autonomous vehicle to operate in this state regardless of whether a licensed human operator is physically present in the vehicle; authorizing the Secretary of Transportation to enroll the state in any federal pilot program or project for the collection and study of data for the review of automated driving systems, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-30SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2018-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Transportation; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2017-11-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H353 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31685Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33964Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33983Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627748Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback