FL S0708 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a physician assistant to sign, certify, stamp, verify, or endorse a document that requires the signature, certification, stamp, verification, or endorsement of a physician; authorizing an advanced registered nurse practitioner to sign, certify, stamp, verify, or endorse a document that requires the signature, certification, stamp, verification, or endorsement of a physician within the framework of an established protocol and under supervision, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Performance of Physician Assistants and Advanced Registered Nurse Practitioners

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H973 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback