FL S0706 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person who engages in privileged communication, a law enforcement crime stoppers coordinator or his or her staff, or an officer, a director, or an employee of a crime stoppers organization from being required to disclose or produce privileged communications or protected information; authorizing a person charged with a criminal offense to petition the court to inspect the protected information under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime Stoppers Organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-14SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-07SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H957 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
90595Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback