FL S0706 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional definitions relating to debt negotiation services. Provides that an attorney providing legal representation is exempt from debt negotiation organization requirements. Specifies acts prohibited by a debt negotiation organization. Provides insurance requirements for such an organization. Provides requirements for debt negotiation service contracts, etc.
Title
Debt Negotiation Services [CPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00053 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-11-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0332 (Similar To) 2010-01-05 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce; General Government Appropriations; Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1702 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H0471 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
H0311 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S1702 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H0471 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
H0311 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0817 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 8071 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 8072 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 8073 | New Code | See Bill Text |