FL S0702 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that certain interests received by a transferee after a divorce are exempt from claims of creditors upon being awarded to or received by the transferee; specifying that such interests remain exempt; providing retroactive applicability, etc.
Title
Individual Retirement Accounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Messages |
2021-04-07 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/02/21, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/16/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H253 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee