FL S0698 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to immediately suspend the license of certain health care practitioners under certain circumstances; defining the term "pelvic examination"; prohibiting health care practitioners and certain students from performing a pelvic examination on a patient without first obtaining the written consent of the patient or the patient's legal representative; establishing the criminal offense of reproductive battery, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reproductive Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#726 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-19 Chapter No. 2020-31
2020-06-18 Approved by Governor
2020-06-03 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (167817)
2020-03-11SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (167817) 1068
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-05HouseIn Messages
2020-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-04SenateAmendment(s) adopted (714748)
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-28SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-19SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-18SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2020-02-11SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-10-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1287 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 698 passed
H1289 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784086Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/Amendment/662392/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/Vote/SenateVote_s00698e1021.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/Vote/HouseVote_s00698e1726.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/698/Vote/SenateVote_s00698e1039.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback