FL S0694 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a court to impose a sentence other than a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment and mandatory fine for a person convicted of trafficking if the court makes certain findings on the record, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory Sentences

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-26SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-26SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-22SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 5
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-31SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-12-04SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-10-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H481 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S602 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback