FL S0694 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing any state agency or department involved in providing health, social, or human services to make payments for medical assistance for certain persons diagnosed with Acquired Immune Deficiency Syndrome (AIDS); requiring that Medicaid recipients enrolled in certain home and community-based service Medicaid waivers be transitioned into the long-term care managed care program by January 1, 2018; requiring the agency to seek federal approval to terminate certain waiver programs once all eligible Medicaid recipients have transitioned into the long-term care managed care program, etc.
Title
Consolidation of Medicaid Waiver Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0619 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
H5201 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
S2514 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-129, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5201 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
S2514 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-129, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 0661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 979 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |