FL S0694 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to propose to the states an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to provide that political contributions and expenditures by corporations be regulated by federal, state, and local governments and establish that corporations and other artificial entities are not human beings entitled to constitutional rights, etc.
Title
Regulation of Political Contributions and Expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0457 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/694 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0694/BillText/Filed/HTML |