FL S0692 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding an existing public records exemption to include the administrative sealing of specified criminal history records; providing for future review and repeal of the expanded exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Sealing of Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-10-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S690 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S862 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H919 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H921 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S860 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
943059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback