FL S0690 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies when the DCA may institute procedures for declaring that a special district is inactive. Specifies the level of detail required for each fund in the sheriff's proposed budget. Amends specified provision relating to the review of the actuarial reports and statements of retirement plans of governmental entities by the DMS. Deletes a time restriction on preparing and presenting a tentative county budget, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Accountability [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0011 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154)
2010-04-27 In Messages
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00887; CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00888
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00852; Amendment(s) adopted (749794, 599336, 453546, 453464, 413618, 368822) -SJ 00853; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00853
2010-04-21 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00702; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2010-04-16 Now in Rules -SJ 00636
2010-04-15 Favorable by Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636
2010-04-12 On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/15/10, 2:00 pm, 412-K
2010-03-16 Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00256
2010-03-12 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-11 CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00256; CS read 1st time on 03/16/10 -SJ 00256
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/11/10, 9:45 am, 301-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00052; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 412-K; CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00155; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00164; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/16/10, 4:00 pm, 110-S; Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00162; On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/03/10, 9:00 am, 301-S --Temporarily postponed
2010-02-26 On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/03/10, 9:00 am, 301-S
2010-02-17 Now in Finance and Tax
2010-02-16 Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2010-02-08 Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/16/10, 4:00 pm, 110-S
2010-02-04 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-02-02 CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2010-01-22 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 412-K
2009-12-17 Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2009-11-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1368 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), SJR 2 (Passed)
H7195 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died, reference deferred, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154)
H5101 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-154; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), SJR 2 (Passed)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
001140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
003049Amended CodeSee Bill Text
011263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0129021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0129201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0166241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01894044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0189412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0189418Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0189419Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0189421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0195087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
021832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
021835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
021839Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0218503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0373536Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101164Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0690&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0690.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0690c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0690c2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0690e1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB06900427100011.html

Bill Comments

feedback