FL S0686 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the licensure requirements for dental therapists to include application and examination fees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Dental Therapists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S684 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H471 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H649 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4660225Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback