FL S0684 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding an exception to an eligibility requirement for expunction of a criminal history record to allow a prior expunction of a criminal history record granted for offenses committed when the person was a minor, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expunction of Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-12-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-10-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H565 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430585Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback